No. 23A1140
Title:Kenneth Kelley, Applicant
v.
William S. Bohrer, Warden, et al.
Docketed:June 21, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-6179)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 17 2024Application (23A1140) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 1, 2024 to August 30, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 24 2024Application (23A1140) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 30, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mary Claire Davis
    Counsel of Record
101 Law School Drive
PO Box 6130
Morgantown, WV 26506

davismaryclaire01@gmail.com
3043954378
Party name: Kenneth Kelley