No. 23A1139
Title:360 Virtual Drone Services LLC, et al., Applicants
v.
Andrew L. Ritter, in His Official Capacity as Executive Director of the North Carolina Board of Examiners for Engineers and Surveyors, et al.
Docketed:June 21, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1472)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 18 2024Application (23A1139) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 18, 2024 to September 9, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther
Jun 24 2024Application (23A1139) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 9, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Samuel Bracken Gedge
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

SGEDGE@IJ.ORG
(703) 682-9320
Party name: 360 Virtual Drone Services LLC, et al.