No. 23A1137
Title:Brian Scott Witham, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:June 21, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-6214)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 18 2024Application (23A1137) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 7, 2024 to September 5, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 23 2024Application (23A1137) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until September 5, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jennifer Niles Coffin
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Services of Eastern Tennessee
800 S. Gay Street
Suite 2400
Knoxville, TN 37929

JENNIFER_COFFIN@FD.ORG
865-637-7979
Party name: Brian Scott Witham
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States