No. 23A1136
Title:Christi Jacobsen, Montana Secretary of State, Applicant
v.
Montana Democratic Party, et al.
Docketed:June 21, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Montana
   Case Numbers:(DA 22-0667)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 13 2024Application (23A1136) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 25, 2024 to August 24, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 24 2024Application (23A1136) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 24, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Montana Attorney General's Office
215 North Sanders Street
Helena, MT 59601

PETER.TORSTENSEN@MT.GOV
406-444-2026
Party name: Christi Jacobsen, in her official capacity as Montana Secretary of State