No. 23A1134
Title:Faresha Sims, Applicant
v.
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation, et al.
Docketed:June 21, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1884)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 19 2024Application (23A1134) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 28, 2024 to September 26, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jun 21 2024Application (23A1134) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 26, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Faresha Sims
    Counsel of Record
555 President St.
Unit 2103
Baltimore, MD 21202

faresha@yahoo.com
(601) 519-8585
Party name: Faresha Sims