No. 23A1133
Title:Jason Gatlin, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:June 21, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-14969, 20-14149)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 18 2024Application (23A1133) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 3, 2024 to September 1, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 24 2024Application (23A1133) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 2, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Caruso
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
150 West Flagler Street
Miami, FL 33175

michael_caruso@fd.org
305-530-7000
Party name: Jason Gatlin
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States