No. 23A1131
Title:Michael Craine, Applicant
v.
AFSCME Council 36, Local 119, et al.
Docketed:June 21, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-55206)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 17 2024Application (23A1131) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 1, 2024 to July 31, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Jun 24 2024Application (23A1131) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 31, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy Ray Snowball
    Counsel of Record
Freedom Foundation
P.O. Box 552
2403 Pacific Ave SE
Olympia, WA 98507

tsnowball@freedomfoundation.com
(360) 956-3482
Party name: Michael Craine