No. 23A1128
Title:Dean Terry, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:June 20, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-4134)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 17 2024Application (23A1128) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 1, 2024 to July 31, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 20 2024Application (23A1128) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 31, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Melissa Baldwin
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, W.D. NC
1 Page Avenue
Suite 210
Asheville, NC 28801

Melissa_Baldwin@fd.org
8282329992
Party name: Dean Terry
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States