No. 23A1127 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Sheldon Hannibal, Applicant
v.
Laurel Harry, Secretary, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:June 20, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-3075)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 12 2024Application (23A1127) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 1, 2024 to August 30, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jun 21 2024Application (23A1127) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 31, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shawn Nolan
    Counsel of Record
Federal Community Defender Office for the EDPA
Suite 545 West - The Curtis
601 Walnut Street
Philadelphia, PA 19106

SHAWN_NOLAN@FD.ORG
215-928-0520
Party name: Sheldon Hannibal