No. 23A1126
Title:Sir Mario Owens, Applicant
v.
Colorado
Docketed:June 20, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(2008SA402)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 13 2024Application (23A1126) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 23, 2024 to August 8, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsOther
Jun 21 2024Application (23A1126) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until July 23, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Gregory Walta
    Counsel of Record
Goodreid Grant & Walta LLC
7761 Shaffer Parkway, Suite 105
Littleton, CO 80127

mwalta@ggandwlaw.com
303-953-5999
Party name: Sir Mario Owens