No. 23A1125
Title:John Ross Stenberg, Applicant
v.
Don Langford, Warden
Docketed:June 20, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-3165)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 07 2024Application (23A1125) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 3, 2024 to September 1, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jun 20 2024Application (23A1125) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until September 2, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Stenberg
    Counsel of Record
#0113332
ECF, P.O. Box 107
Ellsworth, KS 67439-0107

Party name: John Stenberg