No. 23A1124
Title:Kathryn Dana Papp, Applicant
v.
Pennsylvania
Docketed:June 20, 2024
Lower Ct:Superior Court of Pennsylvania, Harrisburg Office
   Case Numbers:(1394 MDA 2022)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 17 2024Application (23A1124) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 1, 2024 to August 30, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 21 2024Application (23A1124) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 30, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

CPHILLIPS@SIDLEY.COM
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: Kathryn Dana Papp