No. 23A1122
Title:Anthony Pandrella, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:June 18, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-2712)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 13 2024Application (23A1122) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 7, 2024 to September 5, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 18 2024Application (23A1122) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until September 5, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marshall Aron Mintz
    Counsel of Record
Mintz Law PLLC
260 Madison Ave.
18th Floor
New York, NY 10016

MMintz@MinOpp.com
2124471800
Party name: Anthony Pandrella
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States