No. 23A1121
Title:Gary Pisner, Applicant
v.
Robert McCarthy, et al.
Docketed:June 18, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1655)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 16 2024Application (23A1121) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 14, 2024 to September 12, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 18 2024Application (23A1121) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 12, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gary Steven Pisner10561 Assembly Drive
Fairfax, VA 22030

gpisner@outlook.com
703-597-6447
Party name: Gary Pisner