No. 23A1120
Title:Malcolm Johnson, et al., Applicants
v.
Tina Kotek, Governor of Oregon, et al.
Docketed:June 17, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-35624)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 12 2024Application (23A1120) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 2, 2024 to August 13, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 18 2024Application (23A1120) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 13, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Stephen J. Joncus
    Counsel of Record
Joncus Law P.C.
13203 SE 172nd Ave Ste 166 #344
Happy Valley, OR 97086

steve@joncus.net
9712361200
Party name: Malcolm Johnson, et al.