No. 23A1118 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Darryl Scott Stinski, Applicant
v.
Warden, Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Prison
Docketed:June 17, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-12898)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 13 2024Application (23A1118) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 5, 2024 to October 4, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 17 2024Application (23A1118) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 4, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

ANDREW.TUTT@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
202-942-5000
Party name: Darryl Scott Stinski