No. 23A1117
Title:Kevin Fahrni, Applicant
v.
United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Docketed:June 17, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-40552)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 28 2024Application (23A1117) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 13, 2024 to August 12, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Jun 26 2024Application (23A1117) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 12, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kevin Fahrni
    Counsel of Record
1941419
Estelle Unit
264 FM 3478
Hunstville, TX 77320

Party name: Kevin Fahrni