No. 23A1116
Title:John Phillip Bender, Applicant
v.
Texas
Docketed:June 18, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Texas
   Case Numbers:(23-0752)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 17 2024Application (23A1116) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 30, 2024 to July 29, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Jun 18 2024Application (23A1116) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 29, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Phillip Bender
    Counsel of Record
#01600287
Clemens Unit - TDC
11034 Hwy 36
Brazoria, TX 77422

Party name: John P. Bender