No. 23A1112
Title:Eric Alan Isaacson, Applicant
v.
Meta Platforms, Inc., fka Facebook, Inc., et al.
Docketed:June 14, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-16904)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 12 2024Application (23A1112) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 30, 2024 to August 29, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 17 2024Application (23A1112) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 29, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Alan Isaacson
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Eric Alan Isaacson
6580 Avenida Mirola
La Jolla, CA 92037-6231

ericalanisaacson@icloud.com
858-263-9581
Party name: Eric Alan Isaacson