No. 23A1111
Title:Roku, Inc., Applicant
v.
International Trade Commission, et al.
Docketed:June 14, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1386)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 12 2024Application (23A1111) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 2, 2024 to August 16, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jun 17 2024Application (23A1111) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 16, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew Joseph Rizzolo
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
700 12th St. NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

matthew.rizzolo@ropesgray.com
202-508-4735
Party name: Roku, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: International Trade Commission