No. 23A1109
Title:LuzMaria Arroyo, Applicant
v.
Volvo Group North America, LLC dba Volvo Parts North America
Docketed:June 12, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1165)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 05 2024Application (23A1109) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 26, 2024 to August 25, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main Document
Jun 14 2024Application (23A1109) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until August 25, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John N. Maher
    Counsel of Record
Maher Legal Services PC
17101 71st Avenue
Tinley Park, IL 60477

john@maherlegalservices.com
708781-9212
Party name: LuzMaria Arroyo