No. 23A1106
Title:Lamar Z. Brooks, Applicant
v.
Ricky D. Dixon, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:June 11, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-10765)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 06 2024Application (23A1106) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 19, 2024 to August 18, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsOther
Jun 11 2024Application (23A1106) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 19, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Linda McDermott
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender for the Northern Dist of Florida
227 N. Bronough St.
Suite 4200
Tallahassee, FL 32301

LINDA_MCDERMOTT@FD.ORG
8509428818
Party name: Lamar Brooks