No. 23A1105
Title:Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc., Applicant
v.
Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, et al.
Docketed:June 11, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1457)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 07 2024Application (23A1105) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 9, 2024 to September 6, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 11 2024Application (23A1105) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 6, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

phughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.