No. 23A1102
Title:Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Applicant
v.
Charles Ramsey
Docketed:June 11, 2024
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Sixth Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(H049949)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 07 2024Application (23A1102) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 30, 2024 to August 29, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 11 2024Application (23A1102) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 29, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Aileen Marie McGrath
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
100 Pine Street
Suite 3200
San Francisco, CA 94111

AMcGrath@akingump.com
415-765-9553
Party name: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC