No. 23A1099
Title:Ryan Crownholm, et al., Applicants
v.
Richard B. Moore, in His Official Capacity as Executive Officer, California Board for Professional Engineers, Land Surveyors, and Geologists, et al.
Docketed:June 10, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-15138)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 06 2024Application (23A1099) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 15, 2024 to September 9, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 10 2024Application (23A1099) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 9, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul Vincent Avelar
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
3200 N Central Ave.
Suite 2160
Phoenix, AZ 85012

pavelar@ij.org
480-557-8300
Party name: Ryan Crownholm, et al.