No. 23A1098
Title:Douglas Fauconier, Applicant
v.
Virginia
Docketed:June 7, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-6116)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 22 2024Application (23A1098) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 10, 2024 to July 10, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jun 11 2024Application (23A1098) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 10, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Douglas Fauconier
    Counsel of Record
1068864
VADOC CENTRALIZED MAIL DISTRIBUTION CENTER
3521 Woods Way
State Farm, VA 23160

Party name: Douglas Fauconier