No. 23A1097
Title:Martin Akerman, Applicant
v.
Merit Systems Protection Board, et al.
Docketed:June 7, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-5309)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 04 2024Application (23A1097) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 26, 2024 to September 25, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jun 17 2024Application (23A1097) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 25, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Martin Akerman
    Counsel of Record
2001 North Adams Street
Unit 440
Arlington , VA 22201

202-656-5601
Party name: Martin Akerman
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Merit Systems Protection Board, et al.