No. 23A1095
Title:Manuel Adams, Jr., Applicant
v.
City of Harahan, Louisiana
Docketed:June 7, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-30218)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 05 2024Application (23A1095) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 27, 2024 to August 26, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 13 2024Application (23A1095) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 29, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

ANDREW.TUTT@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
202-942-5000
Party name: Manuel Adams, Jr.