No. 23A1094
Title:Daniel A. Madero, Applicant
v.
Owen McGuinness
Docketed:June 7, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-2574)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 05 2024Application (23A1094) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 30, 2024 to July 30, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main Document
Jun 10 2024Application (23A1094) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until July 30, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert L. Sirianni Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Brownstone, P.A.
P.O. Box 2047
Winter Park, FL 32789

ROBERTSIRIANNI@BROWNSTONELAW.COM
(407) 388-1900
Party name: Daniel A. Madero