No. 23A1093
Title:Donald Ray Malena, Applicant
v.
Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:June 7, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-11231)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 23 2024Application (23A1093) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 5, 2024 to August 4, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jun 12 2024Application (23A1093) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 4, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Donald Ray Malena2408951
2101 FM 369
N. Allred Unit
Iowa Park, TX 76367

Party name: Donald Malena