No. 23A1092
Title:SC SJ Holdings, LLC, et al., Applicants
v.
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP
Docketed:June 7, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1731)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 03 2024Application (23A1092) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 26, 2024 to August 25, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jun 10 2024Application (23A1092) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 26, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jason Bryan Wesoky
    Counsel of Record
Ogborn Mihm, LLP
1700 Lincoln Street
Suite 2700
Denver, CO 80203

jason.wesoky@OMTrial.com
303-592-5900
Party name: SC SJ Holdings, LLC, et al.