No. 23A1090
Title:Victor Vargas, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:June 6, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-10604)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 31 2024Application (23A1090) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 2, 2024 to August 1, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 06 2024Application (23A1090) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 1, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Margaret Yvonne Foldes
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
1 E. Broward Blvd.
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

MARGARET_FOLDES@FD.ORG
9543567436
Party name: Victor Vargas
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States