No. 23A1089
Title:Jimmie L. Bowen, Applicant
v.
Ricky D. Dixon, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Docketed:June 6, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-11744)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 03 2024Application (23A1089) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 4, 2024 to August 3, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 06 2024Application (23A1089) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 5, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robyn M. Blake
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Robyn M. Blake, PA
20295 N.W. 2nd Avenue
Suite 215
Miami, FL 33169

law@robynblake.com
3056515505
Party name: Jimmie Bowen