No. 23A1085
Title:Alexander Cote, et al., Applicants
v.
Office of the California State Controller, et al.
Docketed:June 5, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-15375, 23-15377)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 03 2024Application (23A1085) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 12, 2024 to July 28, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
Jun 06 2024Application (23A1085) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 28, 2024.
Jul 18 2024Application of Jennifer Sykes, et al. for a further extension of time submitted.
Written RequestWritten RequestWritten RequestWritten RequestProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark Carl Rifkin
    Counsel of Record
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP
270 Madison Ave., 9th Floor
New York, NY 10016

rifkin@whafh.com
212.545.4600
Party name: Jennifer Sykes, et al.