No. 23A1083
Title:Justin G. Reedy, Applicant
v.
California Department of Social Services, et al.
Docketed:June 4, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-16214)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 30 2024Application (23A1083) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 3, 2024 to August 2, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Jun 04 2024Application (23A1083) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 2, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Justin G. Reedy
    Counsel of Record
7295 Amherst St.
Sacramento, CA 95822

(916) 428-1510
Party name: Justin G. Reedy