No. 23A1076
Title:Jason Wade Grant, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 31, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-10710)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 17 2024Application (23A1076) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 3, 2024 to August 2, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
May 31 2024Application (23A1076) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 2, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jason Wade Grant
    Counsel of Record
#32338-510
FCI Victorville
PO Box 3725
Adelanto, CA 92301

Party name: Jason Wade Grant
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States