No. 23A1075
Title:Bruce L. Hay, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 31, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-3276)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 29 2024Application (23A1075) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 17, 2024 to July 17, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main Document
Jun 06 2024Application (23A1075) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until July 17, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David A. O'Neil
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
801 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W. – Suite 500
Washington, DC 20004

DAONEIL@DEBEVOISE.COM
(202) 383-8000
Party name: Bruce Hay
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States