No. 23A1074
Title:Sony Music Entertainment, et al., Applicants
v.
Cox Communications, Incorporated, et al.
Docketed:May 31, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1168)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 29 2024Application (23A1074) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 17, 2024 to August 16, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 03 2024Application (23A1074) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 16, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

CATE.STETSON@HOGANLOVELLS.COM
2026375491
Party name: Sony Music Entertainment, et al.