No. 23A1067
Title:Catholic Charities Bureau, Inc., et al., Applicants
v.
Wisconsin Labor & Industry Review Commission, et al.
Docketed:May 30, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Wisconsin
   Case Numbers:(2020AP2007)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 28 2024Application (23A1067) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 12, 2024 to August 11, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 30 2024Application (23A1067) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until August 11, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

ERASSBACH@BECKETLAW.ORG
2029550095
Party name: Catholic Charities Bureau, Inc., et al.