No. 23A1066
Title:Cox Communications, Incorporated, et al., Applicants
v.
Sony Music Entertainment, et al.
Docketed:May 30, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1168)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 28 2024Application (23A1066) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 17, 2024 to August 16, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 03 2024Application (23A1066) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 16, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

JROSENKRANZ@ORRICK.COM
212-506-5380
Party name: Cox Communications, Inc., et al.