No. 23A1062
Title:Coalition Life, Applicant
v.
City of Carbondale, Illinois
Docketed:May 29, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-2367)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2024Application (23A1062) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 6, 2024 to July 16, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 29 2024Application (23A1062) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until July 16, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

PAUL.CLEMENT@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Coalition Life