No. 23A1058
Title:Ocean State Tactical, LLC, dba Big Bear Hunting and Fishing Supply, et al, Applicants
v.
Rhode Island, et al.
Docketed:May 30, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1072)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2024Application (23A1058) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 5, 2024 to July 5, 2024, submitted to Justice Jackson.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 30 2024Application (23A1058) granted by Justice Jackson extending the time to file until July 5, 2024.
Jun 20 2024Application (23A1058) to extend further the time from July 5, 2024 to August 4, 2024, submitted to Justice Jackson.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jun 24 2024Application (23A1058) granted by Justice Jackson extending the time to file until August 4, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Erin E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

ERIN.MURPHY@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Ocean State Tactical, LLC, et al.