No. 23A1053
Title:Jeromy Shiedenhelm, Applicant
v.
Ricky D. Dixon, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:May 24, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-11997)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 13 2024Application (23A1053) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 19, 2024 to August 18, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 24 2024Application (23A1053) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 19, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeromy Shiedenhelm
    Counsel of Record
#V18974
Martin Correctional Institution
1150 Allapattah Rd.
Indian Town, FL 34956

Party name: Jeromy Shiedenhelm