No. 23A1051
Title:Joseph Roach, Applicant
v.
Amy Robey, Warden
Docketed:May 24, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-5879)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 15 2024Application (23A1051) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 22, 2024 to July 21, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 24 2024Application (23A1051) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until July 21, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph Roach
    Counsel of Record
Luther Luckett Correctional Complex
P.O. Box 6
La Grange, KY 40031

Party name: Joseph Roach