No. 23A1050
Title:Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, dba Labcorp, Applicant
v.
Luke Davis, et al.
Docketed:May 24, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-55873)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 22 2024Application (23A1050) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 17, 2024 to September 13, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 25 2024Application (23A1050) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 13, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel John Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

NJFRANCISCO@JONESDAY.COM
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, d/b/a Labcorp