No. 23A1048
Title:Quentin Veneno, Jr., Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 23, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2101)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 21 2024Application (23A1048) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 5, 2024 to July 10, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 24 2024Application (23A1048) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until July 5, 2024.
Jun 21 2024Application (23A1048) to extend further the time from July 5, 2024 to July 26, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written RequestOtherOtherProof of Service
Jun 26 2024Application (23A1048) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until July 26, 2024. No further extensions will be granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alan Mouritsen
    Counsel of Record
Parsons Behle & Latimer
201 South Main Street
Suite 1800
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

AMOURITSEN@PARSONSBEHLE.COM
8015366927
Party name: Quentin Veneno, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States