No. 23A1047
Title:Kwok Sum Wong, Applicant
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:May 23, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-6185)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 20 2024Application (23A1047) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 9, 2024 to July 25, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
May 20 2024Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
May 23 2024Application (23A1047) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until July 25, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin Hayes
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N. Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

bhayes@goodwinlaw.com
(202) 346-4000
Party name: Kwok Sum Wong
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Garland, Merrick B.