No. 23A1046
Title:Desiree Martinez, Applicant
v.
Channon High
Docketed:May 23, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-16335)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 20 2024Application (23A1046) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 4, 2024 to August 2, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 23 2024Application (23A1046) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 2, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anna Aleksandrovna Bidwell
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Rd.
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

ABIDWELL@IJ.ORG
7036829320
Party name: Desiree Martinez