No. 23A1043 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Nidal M. Hasan, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 22, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(21-0193)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 20 2024Application (23A1043) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 2, 2024 to August 1, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 23 2024Application (23A1043) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 1, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States