No. 23A1040
Title:Al Dorsey, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 22, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-5082)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 21 2024Application (23A1040) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 24, 2024 to August 23, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main Document
May 22 2024Application (23A1040) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until August 23, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jennifer Niles Coffin
    Counsel of Record
Fed. Pub. Def. for the Middle Dist. of TN
810 Broadway
Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203

JENNIFER_COFFIN@FD.ORG
6157365047
Party name: Al Dorsey
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States